PA HB1567 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-14)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-11 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-11 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for publication of guidelines for sentencing, resentencing and parole and recommitment ranges following revocation, for adoption of guidelines for sentencing, for adoption of guidelines for resentencing and for adoption of guidelines for parole; providing for adoption of certain recommitment ranges; and further providing for publication of guidelines for sentencing, resentencing and parole and recommitment ranges following revocation, for sentences for second and subsequent offenses and for sentencing generally.
Title
Further providing for publication of guidelines for sentencing, resentencing and parole and recommitment ranges following revocation, for adoption of guidelines for sentencing, for adoption of guidelines for resentencing and for adoption of guidelines for parole; providing for adoption of certain recommitment ranges; and further providing for publication of guidelines for sentencing, resentencing and parole and recommitment ranges following revocation, for sentences for second and subsequent offenses and for sentencing generally.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-09-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-23 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-23 | First consideration | |
2009-06-23 | Reported as amended | |
2009-05-29 | Referred to JUDICIARY |