PA HB1847 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-01 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-01 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 24, 1968 (P.L.1040, No.318), known as the Coal Refuse Disposal Control Act, further providing for findings and declaration of policy, for definitions and for site selection; and establishing the Coal Bed Methane Review Board to resolve disputes between property owners over the location of coal bed methane wells and access roads.
Title
Further providing for findings and declaration of policy, for definitions and for site selection; and establishing the Coal Bed Methane Review Board to resolve disputes between property owners over the location of coal bed methane wells and access roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-25 - House - HB 1847 PN 2794, CONCUR (Y: 183 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-16 - Senate - HB 1847 PN 2794, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-17 - House - HB 1847 PN 2428, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 183 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-16 - Senate - HB 1847 PN 2794, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-17 - House - HB 1847 PN 2428, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 183 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Act No. 4 | |
2010-02-01 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-01-26 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-01-26 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-01-25 | Signed in House | |
2010-01-25 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-01-25 | Reported as committed | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to RULES | |
2009-12-16 | In the House | |
2009-12-16 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-10-09 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-10-01 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-10-01 | Second consideration | |
2009-09-30 | First consideration | |
2009-09-30 | Reported as committed | |
2009-09-21 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2009-09-17 | In the Senate | |
2009-09-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-08-20 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-20 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-17 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-17 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-04 | Second consideration | |
2009-08-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-08-03 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-08-03 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-22 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-07-22 | First consideration | |
2009-07-22 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-10 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |