PA HB1884 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 1, 1974 (P.L.34, No.15), known as the Pennsylvania Municipal Retirement Law, further providing for general provisions, for provisions relating to municipal employees, for provisions relating to municipal firemen and municipal police officers and for optional retirement plans; providing for the Municipal Pension Recovery Program and for the Cooperative Municipal Pension and Security Program; and making editorial changes.
Title
Further providing for general provisions, for provisions relating to municipal employees, for provisions relating to municipal firemen and municipal police officers and for optional retirement plans; providing for the Municipal Pension Recovery Program and for the Cooperative Municipal Pension and Security Program; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-20 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-20 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-16 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-16 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-21 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-21 | Laid on the table | |
2010-01-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-01-26 | Laid on the table | |
2009-11-16 | Removed from table | |
2009-11-16 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-18 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-18 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-18 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-18 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-05 | Second consideration | |
2009-08-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-08-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-08-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-30 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-07-30 | First consideration | |
2009-07-30 | Reported as amended | |
2009-07-22 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |