PA HB2053 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-12 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on November 21 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-12 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 25, 1945 (P.L.1050, No.394), known as the Local Tax Collection Law, providing for a transition from township treasurers to tax collectors in first class townships; and making editorial changes.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 25, 1945 (P.L.1050, No.394), known as the Local Tax Collection Law, providing for a transition from township treasurers to tax collectors in first class townships; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-03-12 | Removed from table | |
2008-03-11 | Laid on the table | |
2008-03-11 | First consideration | |
2008-03-11 | Reported as committed | |
2007-11-21 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2053 |