PA HB2092 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in disposition of abandoned and unclaimed property, further providing for certificate of finder registration, for notice and publication of lists of property subject to custody and control of the Commonwealth under this article, for income accruing after payment or delivery, for deposit of funds, for determination of claims, for penalties and for interdepartmental cooperation and providing for annual report.
Title
In disposition of abandoned and unclaimed property, further providing for certificate of finder registration, for notice and publication of lists of property subject to custody and control of the Commonwealth under this article, for income accruing after payment or delivery, for deposit of funds, for determination of claims, for penalties and for interdepartmental cooperation and providing for annual report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2092 PN 3143, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2092 PN 3143, 2023 A5475, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04512 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2092 PN 3143, 2023 A5475, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04512 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-12 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2024-07-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-07-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2024-07-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-07-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-07-10 | House | Second consideration |
2024-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2024-05-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-05-21 | House | First consideration |
2024-05-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to FINANCE |