PA HB2124 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 121
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 121
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for information regarding education loans.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for information regarding education loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10439 (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10441 (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10442 (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10443 (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2124 PN 4277, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2124 PN 4277, CONCUR (Y: 180 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2124 PN 3122, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05871 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05821 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 7 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10441 (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10442 (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10443 (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2124 PN 4277, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2124 PN 4277, CONCUR (Y: 180 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2124 PN 3122, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05871 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05821 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 7 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 121 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (180-1) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-17 | House | In the House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (39-10) |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2018-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-10 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |