PA HB2208 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 17, 2016 (P.L.84, No.16), known as the Medical Marijuana Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in medical marijuana controls, further providing for electronic tracking and for laboratory; and, in Medical Marijuana Advisory Board, further providing for advisory board.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in medical marijuana controls, further providing for electronic tracking and for laboratory; and, in Medical Marijuana Advisory Board, further providing for advisory board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2208 PN 3078, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2208 PN 3014, 2023 A4396 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2208 PN 3014, 2023 A4325 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04224 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2208 PN 3014, 2023 A4396 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2208 PN 3014, 2023 A4325 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04224 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2024-05-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-05-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-6) |
2024-05-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-05-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-05-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2024-05-07 | House | Removed from table |
2024-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to HEALTH |