PA HB2407 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to emergency management services, further providing for definitions; in Commonwealth services, further providing for State Fire Commissioner; in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for scope of chapter, for definitions, for publication and notice, for award of grants, for consolidation incentive, for establishment, for publication and notice and for award of grants, repealing provisions relating to COVID-19 Crisis Fire Company and Emergency Medical Services Grant Program, further providing for Fire Company Grant Program and for Emergency Services Company Grant Program, repealing provisions relating to additional funding and to COVID-19 Crisis Fire Company and Emergency Medical Services Grant Program, providing for hazardous materials and specialty funding, further providing for allocation of appropriated funds, repealing provisions relating to Emergency Medical Services COVID-19 Recovery Grant Program, providing for Hazardous Materials Team and Specialty Team Grant Program, further providing for expiration of authority, repealing provisions relating to expiration of authority relating to COVID-19 Crisis Fire Company and Emergency Medical Services Grant Program and further providing for special provisions and for annual reports; and making transfers.
Title
In general provisions relating to emergency management services, further providing for definitions; in Commonwealth services, further providing for State Fire Commissioner; in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for scope of chapter, for definitions, for publication and notice, for award of grants, for consolidation incentive, for establishment, for publication and notice and for award of grants, repealing provisions relating to COVID-19 Crisis Fire Company and Emergency Medical Services Grant Program, further providing for Fire Company Grant Program and for Emergency Services Company Grant Program, repealing provisions relating to additional funding and to COVID-19 Crisis Fire Company and Emergency Medical Services Grant Program, providing for hazardous materials and specialty funding, further providing for allocation of appropriated funds, repealing provisions relating to Emergency Medical Services COVID-19 Recovery Grant Program, providing for Hazardous Materials Team and Specialty Team Grant Program, further providing for expiration of authority, repealing provisions relating to expiration of authority relating to COVID-19 Crisis Fire Company and Emergency Medical Services Grant Program and further providing for special provisions and for annual reports; and making transfers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2407 PN 3428, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05294 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2407 PN 3366, 2023 A5149 (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A05041 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05294 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2407 PN 3366, 2023 A5149 (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A05041 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-12 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2024-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (102-100) |
2024-06-27 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2024-06-27 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2024-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-24 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2024-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2024-06-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2024-06-11 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |