PA HB420 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 9 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 99
Status: Enrolled on October 9 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 99
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 23, 2002 (P.L.298, No.39), known as the Main Street Act, further providing for the Main Street Program.
Title
An Act amending the act of April 23, 2002 (P.L.298, No.39), known as the Main Street Act, further providing for the Main Street Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-10-09 | Approved by the Governor | |
2008-10-09 | Presented to the Governor | |
2008-10-08 | Signed in Senate | |
2008-10-08 | Signed in House | |
2008-10-07 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-10-06 | Second consideration | |
2008-10-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-09-22 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-17 | First consideration | |
2008-09-17 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-14 | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT | |
2007-06-11 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-11 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-05 | Second consideration | |
2007-05-24 | Removed from table | |
2007-05-22 | Laid on the table | |
2007-05-22 | First consideration | |
2007-05-22 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-13 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=420 |