PA HB544 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 98
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 98
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for liability for landowners to recreational users.
Title
Amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for liability for landowners to recreational users.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 544 PN 4273, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 4273, CONCUR (Y: 181 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 2193, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 710, 2017 A2257, LONGIETTI (Y: 172 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 710, 2017 A1763, MAHER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 544 PN 4273, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 4273, CONCUR (Y: 181 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 2193, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 710, 2017 A2257, LONGIETTI (Y: 172 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 544 PN 710, 2017 A1763, MAHER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 98 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (181-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-17 | House | In the House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2017-12-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-12-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-0) |
2017-12-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-29 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-06 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |