PA HB81 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 18, 2001 (P.L.949, No.114), known as the Workforce Development Act, in local workforce investment areas and boards, providing for youth councils.
Title
In local workforce investment areas and boards, providing for youth councils.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-05 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |