PA HR107 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution adopting a temporary Rule of the House of Representatives relating to guidance from the Centers for Disease Control (CDC) minimizing the spread of COVID-19.
Title
Adopting a temporary Rule of the House of Representatives relating to guidance from the Centers for Disease Control (CDC) minimizing the spread of COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-09 | House | Removed from table |
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to RULES |