PA HR203 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-6)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-6)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to study the effects of parental incarceration on children of incarcerated parents; to recommend a system for determining and assessing the needs of children of incarcerated parents, services available to them, and barriers to accessing those services; and making a report with recommendations to the House of Representatives by November 30, 2010.
Title
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to study the effects of parental incarceration on children of incarcerated parents; to recommend a system for determining and assessing the needs of children of incarcerated parents, services available to them, and barriers to accessing those services; and making a report with recommendations to the House of Representatives by November 30, 2010.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - House - HR 203 PN 1321 (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Adopted | |
2009-06-02 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |