PA HR408 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution opposing all actions by the Federal Government to replace the dollar as the official United States currency with any other type of multinational or global currency or any creation of a global reserve currency, including, but not limited to, the expansion of the scope of the International Monetary Fund's Special Drawing Rights and any delegation of the United States sovereignty to a coordinated international monetary regulatory body.
Title
Opposing all actions by the Federal Government to replace the dollar as the official United States currency with any other type of multinational or global currency or any creation of a global reserve currency, including, but not limited to, the expansion of the scope of the International Monetary Fund's Special Drawing Rights and any delegation of the United States sovereignty to a coordinated international monetary regulatory body.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-20 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-20 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-16 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-16 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-21 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-21 | Laid on the table | |
2010-01-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-01-26 | Laid on the table | |
2009-11-16 | Removed from table | |
2009-11-16 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-18 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-18 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-20 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-20 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-17 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-17 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-03 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-03 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-17 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-14 | Referred to COMMERCE |