PA SB1164 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Act No. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Act No. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, providing for drug overdose response immunity.
Title
Providing for drug overdose response immunity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - Senate - SB 1164 PN 1544, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - Senate - SB 1164 PN 1544, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Senate | Act No. 139 |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-09-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2328 |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-09-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-09-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-17 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-12-10 | House | In the House |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |