PA SB1165 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 63 (Professions and Occupations (State Licensed)) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers and duties, providing for criminal history background checks.
Title
In powers and duties, providing for criminal history background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1165 PN 1534, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1165 PN 1534, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-07-01 | House | Second consideration |
2024-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2024-06-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2024-06-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2024-06-07 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2024-06-05 | House | In the House |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-4) |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |