PA SB1225 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for discount.
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for discount.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Tracy Pennycuick [R] | Sen. Daniel Laughlin [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] |
Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Nicholas Miller [D] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt Amendment A05156 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |