PA SB1232 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of U.S. Route 30 in Hempfield Township, Southwest Greensburg Borough, the City of Greensburg, and South Greensburg Borough, Westmoreland County, as the J. Edward "Hutch" Hutchinson Memorial Bypass.
Title
Designating a portion of U.S. Route 30 in Hempfield Township, Southwest Greensburg Borough, the City of Greensburg, and South Greensburg Borough, Westmoreland County, as the J. Edward "Hutch" Hutchinson Memorial Bypass.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1232 PN 1961, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-05 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-10-02 | House | In the House |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1961 |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |