PA SB1235 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 94 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 94 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in comprehensive health care for uninsured children, further providing for contracts and coverage packages.
Title
In comprehensive health care for uninsured children, further providing for contracts and coverage packages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-06 - House - House Floor: SB 1235 PN 1649, FP (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1235 PN 1649, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1235 PN 1649, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 94 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-1) |
2022-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2022-06-08 | House | In the House |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-05-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |