PA SB1290 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring the disclosure of mobile communications tracking information; and providing for immunity.
Title
Requiring the disclosure of mobile communications tracking information; and providing for immunity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Act No. 181 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-10-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2014-10-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-06 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-06 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-23 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2014-04-08 | House | In the House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1922 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |