PA SB155 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 2005 (P.L.474, No.94), known as the Breach of Personal Information Notification Act, further providing for notification of breach.
Title
Further providing for notification of breach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - SB 155 PN 125, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2009-04-01 | In the House | |
2009-04-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-31 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-18 | First consideration | |
2009-03-18 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |