PA SB232 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-02 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-02 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for criminal history record expungement.
Title
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for criminal history record expungement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-02 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2008-04-28 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-04-08 | Second consideration | |
2008-04-07 | Amended on second consideration | |
2008-04-01 | Removed from table | |
2008-01-15 | Laid on the table | |
2007-11-20 | First consideration | |
2007-11-20 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-07 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=232 |