PA SB430 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions.
Title
In realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-05-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |