PA SB458 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on November 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-22 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on November 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-22 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 20, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.96, No.6), known as the Mental Health and Mental Retardation Act of 1966, updating and modernizing certain terminology.
Title
Updating and modernizing certain terminology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-01 - House - SB 458 PN 1299, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - SB 458 PN 1299, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - SB 458 PN 1299, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-22 | House | Act No. 105 |
2011-11-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2011-11-15 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2011-11-14 | House | Signed in House |
2011-11-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2011-11-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2011-11-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-10-31 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-10-31 | House | Second consideration |
2011-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-05 | House | First consideration |
2011-10-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |
2011-06-22 | House | In the House |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |