PA SB636 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Corrections and the Governor, to lease to the County of Wayne a portion of the lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at the State Correctional Institution - Waymart, situate in the Township of Canaan and Borough of Waymart, County of Wayne.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Corrections and the Governor, to lease to the County of Wayne a portion of the lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at the State Correctional Institution - Waymart, situate in the Township of Canaan and Borough of Waymart, County of Wayne.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 636 PN 755, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2021-09-27 | House | In the House |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |