PA SB795 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-16 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-16 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, establishing the Pennsylvania Award for Student Success Scholarship Program.
Title
Establishing the Pennsylvania Award for Student Success Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A04368 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-16 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |