RI S2465 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurers to maintain accurate and up-to-date directories of all in-network providers, and to provide that information to plan enrollees.
Title
Meaningful Access To Accurate Provider Directories
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/26/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2016) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2465.pdf |