RI S2523 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Legislative Commission To Study Student Transportation Needs And System Costs (creates A 13-member Joint Commission To Study The Transportation Needs Of Students And Recommend What Changes Are Necessary, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By April 16, 2025, And Expire On May 27, 2025.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL JOINT LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY STUDENT TRANSPORTATION NEEDS AND SYSTEM COSTS (Creates a 13-member joint commission to study the transportation needs of students and recommend what changes are necessary, and who would report back to the General Assembly by April 16, 2025, and expire on May 27, 2025.)
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Ujifusa [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed Sub B |
2024-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2024-06-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2024) |
2024-05-31 | House | Referred to House Education |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2024) |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2024) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/24/2024) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/24/2024) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |