RI S2720 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the wage amount for working prisoners, committed to the adult correctional institution, from three dollars ($3.00) a day to the minimum hourly wage amount for most workers currently set at twelve dollars and twenty-five cents ($12.25) per hour.
Title
Corrections Department
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] |
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2022) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2720.pdf |