RI S2859 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This act serves as the enabling act required by ยง 16-7-44 of the general laws in order for the principal and interest on bonds issued in support of school housing projects to be eligible for state housing aid reimbursement.
Title
IN ACCORDANCE WITH RHODE ISLAND GENERAL LAWS SECTION 16-7-44 APPROVING THE ISSUANCE OF $125,000,000 GENERAL OBLIGATION BONDS, NOTES AND OTHER EVIDENCES OF INDEBTEDNESS OF THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE TO FINANCE THE CONSTRUCTION, RENOVATION, IMPROVEMENT, ALTERATION, REPAIR, LANDSCAPING, FURNISHING AND EQUIPPING OF SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL FACILITIES THROUGHOUT THE CITY AND ALL COSTS RELATED THERETO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-05-14 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-05-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/14/2024) |
2024-05-09 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-05-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-05-06 | House | Meeting postponed (05/07/2024) |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2024-04-18 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/11/2024) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |