SC H3114 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Use Of Barbituric Acid Derivatives, And Carbon Monoxide Gas Are Not Allowable Methods Of Euthanasia And To Provide That The Use Of Sodium Pentobarbital And Other Substances Or Procedures That Are Humane May Be Used To Perform Euthanasia.
Title
Euthanasia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight | |
2012-01-19 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-07 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3114&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/3114_20101207.htm |