SC H3207 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Member
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Member
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Membership Of The Commission And Change The Commission's Process For Nominating Judicial Candidates From The Nomination Of Three Qualified Candidates To The Release Of A List Of All Qualified Candidates To The General Assembly.
Title
Judicial Merit Selection Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Josiah Magnuson [R] | Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. Anne Thayer [R] |
Rep. Joshua Putnam [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Member |
2017-01-11 | House | Member |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 19 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3207&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3207_20161215.htm |