SC H3370 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-27 - Referred to Committee on Invitations
Pending: Senate Invitations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-27 - Referred to Committee on Invitations
Pending: Senate Invitations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Invite The National Commander Of The American Legion, The Honorable Jimmie Foster, To Address The General Assembly In Joint Session In The Chamber Of The South Carolina House Of Representatives At 12:30 P.m. On Tuesday, March 1, 2011.
Title
American Legion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-27 - House - House: Adopt Concurrent Resolution (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 24 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Adopt Concurrent Resolution (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 24 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Adopt Concurrent Resolution (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 24 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Invitations | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced | |
2011-01-27 | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-3 | |
2011-01-27 | Adopted, sent to Senate | |
2011-01-26 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced |