SC H3370 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Erickson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Erickson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 16-3-1656 So As To Require Nonprofit Victim Assistance Organizations That Serve Victims Of Domestic Violence And Sexual Assault To Protect The Confidentiality And Privacy Of Clients, With Exceptions; And By Adding Section 19-11-110 So As To Prohibit Employees, Agents, And Volunteers Of Such Organizations From Testifying In Actions Or Proceedings About Communications Made By A Client Or Records Kept During The Course Of Providing Services To The Client, With Exceptions, And For Other Purposes.
Title
Victim assistance organizations, nonprofit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Erickson |
2019-03-05 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell |
2019-02-27 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-5-19 |
2019-02-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy, Kimmons, Chellis |
2019-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford |
2019-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter |
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein |
2019-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |