SC H3886 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-11)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 245
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-11)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 245
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require These Statements Include Whether Property Is Subject To Governance Of A Homeowners Association Which Carries Certain Rights And Obligations That May Limit Use Of The Property And Involve Financial Obligations
Title
Homeowner's Associations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 245 | |
2018-05-30 | Effective date 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 245 | |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2018-04-26 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2018-04-26 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2018-04-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-26-18 |
2018-04-19 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-25-18 |
2018-04-18 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-19-18 |
2018-04-17 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-18-18 |
2018-04-11 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-17-18 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Johnson, Turner, Gambrell |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-30 | House | Amended |
2017-03-29 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-30-17 |
2017-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Taylor, King, Daning, Spires, Henderson, Pitts, Kirby, White, McCravy, Hill, Gagnon, West, Wheeler, Davis, Murphy, Hayes, Ott, V.S.Moss, Lowe, McKnight, Jordan |
2017-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: S.Rivers |
2017-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper, Brown |
2017-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Rivers |
2017-03-22 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-03-21 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-22-17 |
2017-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett, Thigpen |
2017-03-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2017-03-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crosby |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile |
2017-03-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bowers |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0576 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Johnson, Turner, Gambrell
S0082 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
S0104 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
S0122 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
H3301 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crosby
S0082 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
S0104 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
S0122 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
H3301 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crosby