SC S0104 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specify That Authorization Includes Investigation Of Homeowners Associations.
Title
S.C. Homeowners Association Act
Sponsors
Sen. Luke Rankin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0082 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
S0122 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
H3301 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crosby
S0576 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Johnson, Turner, Gambrell
H3886 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Act No. 245
S0122 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
H3301 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crosby
S0576 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Johnson, Turner, Gambrell
H3886 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Act No. 245
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 3 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 50 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 31 | 171 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0104&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/104_20161213.htm |