SC S0576 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Johnson, Turner, Gambrell
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Johnson, Turner, Gambrell
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Include Provisions Concerning Disclosures Of Property Subject To Homeowners Association Governance.
Title
Homeowner's Associations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Johnson, Turner, Gambrell |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3886 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Act No. 245
S0082 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
S0104 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
S0122 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
H3301 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crosby
S0082 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
S0104 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
S0122 (Similar To) 2017-01-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
H3301 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crosby
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0576&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/576_20170322.htm |