SC H3904 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Act No. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Act No. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Make Technical Changes, To Provide That Lien Recordings May Be Electronically Transmitted To The Department, To Provide That The Owners Of Motor Vehicles Or Mobile Homes May Retain The Electronic Copy Of The Vehicle's Title With The Department Once All Liens Are Satisfied, To Provide That The Department May Convene A Working Group To Develop Program Specifications Relating To Governing The Transmission Of Electronic Lien Information, And To Substitute The Term "state Treasurer" For The Term "comptroller General"
Title
Motor vehicle dealers
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. William Crosby [R] | Rep. James Merrill [R] | Rep. Gary Simrill [R] |
Rep. James Lucas [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Act No. 201 | |
2014-06-06 | Effective date 06/02/14 | |
2014-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 253 | |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-05-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2014-04-30 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-30 | House | Amended |
2014-04-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |