SC H4687 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge That Crosses Teals Mill Pond And Bear Creek Along Teals Mill Road In Chesterfield County "teals Mill Memorial Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.
Title
Teals Mill Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-08 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced |