SC S0028 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 179
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 179
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The School District Board Of Trustees May, As A Means To Ensure Evaluation Of Instruction On The Basis Of Purely Secular Criteria, Accept Released Time Credits As Transfer Credits From An Accredited Private School That Has Awarded Private School Credits For A Released Time Program Operated By An Unaccredited Entity; And To Make These Provisions Effective July 1, 2018
Title
High school students, religious instruction, elective credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 20 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 179 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date 07/01/18 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 195 | |
2018-05-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-20 |
2018-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-2-18 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Sabb, Talley |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |