SC S0236 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
By Adding Section 2-1-190 To Provide That No Person Shall Be Eligible For Election To The House Of Representatives If That Person Has Served Six Terms In The Same Body, And That No Person Shall Be Eligible For Election To The Senate If That Person Has Served Four Terms In The Same Body, And To Provide That Any Term Served For Which The Election Was Held Prior To January 1, 2011, Shall Not Be Counted As A Term Served.
Title
House of Representatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-08 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-08 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3001 (Similar To) 2010-11-17 - Introduced and adopted
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0236&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/236_20101208.htm |