SC S0308 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-1-143, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Home-based Food Production Operations, So As To Allow A Home-based Food Production Operation To Sell Food To An Informed Person And To Require A Disclosure On Certain Food Products.
Title
Home-based food production operations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Polled out of committee Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committed to Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |