SC S0631 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Electronic Notary Public Act" By Adding Chapter 2 To Title 26 So As To Define Necessary Terms; To Provide Procedures And Training Requirements To Become An Electronic Notary; To Provide For Acts That May Be Performed Electronically; To Provide Restrictions For The Performance Of Electronic Notarization; To Provide The Requirements To Complete An Electronic Notarization; To Establish Maximum Fees; To Limit The Use Of The Electronic Signature And Seal To Proper Electronic Notarial Acts; To Require The Maintenance Of An Electronic Journal For Electronic Notarial Acts; To Require The Safekeeping Of An Electronic Journal, Public Key Certificate, And Electronic Seal; To Allow The Secretary Of State To Promulgate Rules And Regulations; To Require Registration With The Secretary Of State; To Require An Electronic Notary To Utilize Current Registered Devices; To Provide For The Termination Of Electronic Notaries Public; To Provide Penalties; To Apply Requirements Of Notarial Certificates To Electronic Notaries Public; To Require Evidence Of Authenticity; And To Provide Language For An Electronic Certificate Of Authority; And To Amend Section 26-1-160, Relating To Unlawful Acts, So As To Allow The Secretary Of State To Terminate A Notary Public's Commission. - Ratified Title
Title
SC Electronic Notary Public Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 85 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/18/21 | |
2021-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-18 | Ratified R 104 | |
2021-05-13 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-1 |
2021-05-12 | House | Read second time |
2021-05-11 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4063 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton