SC S169 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-150
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-150
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 2-1-190 TO PROVIDE THAT NO PERSON SHALL BE ELIGIBLE FOR ELECTION TO THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES IF THAT PERSON HAS SERVED SIX TERMS IN THE SAME BODY, AND THAT NO PERSON SHALL BE ELIGIBLE FOR ELECTION TO THE SENATE IF THAT PERSON HAS SERVED FOUR TERMS IN THE SAME BODY, AND TO PROVIDE THAT ANY TERM SERVED FOR WHICH THE ELECTION WAS HELD PRIOR TO JANUARY 1, 2009, SHALL NOT BE COUNTED AS A TERM SERVED.
Title
By Adding Section 2-1-190 To Provide That No Person Shall Be Eligible For Election To The House Of Representatives If That Person Has Served Six Terms In The Same Body, And That No Person Shall Be Eligible For Election To The Senate If That Person Has Served Four Terms In The Same Body, And To Provide That Any Term Served For Which The Election Was Held Prior To January 1, 2009, Shall Not Be Counted As A Term Served.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-150 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time SJ-150 | |
2008-12-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2008-12-10 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3213 (Similar To) 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-96
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0169&session=118 |