SD HB1032 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding money transmission.
Title
Revise provisions regarding money transmission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019 H.J. 760 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 H.J. 674 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 637 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 647 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 596 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 547 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 157 |
2019-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 148 |
2019-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 141 |
2019-01-16 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-16 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 128 |
2019-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 23 |