SD HB1042 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain health care professionals who have complied with the requirements of the recruitment assistance program or the rural health care facility recruitment assistance program and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain health care professionals who have complied with the requirements of the recruitment assistance program or the rural health care facility recruitment assistance program and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 07, 2017 H.J. 337 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 318 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 297 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 282 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 255 |
2017-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 234 |
2017-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 218 |
2017-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 203 |
2017-01-20 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. H.J. 158 |
2017-01-20 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1042sa |
2017-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 25 |