SD HB1131 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize primary care agreements.
Title
Authorize primary care agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 470 |
2021-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 H.J. 547 |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 441 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 350 |
2021-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 2. H.J. 390 |
2021-02-23 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 154 |