SD HB1155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for certain privileged communications between social workers and students.
Title
Provide for certain privileged communications between social workers and students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 706 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 675 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 611 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 610 Amendment 1155ja |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 595 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 517 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1155ca |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 368 |
2019-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 13. H.J. 378 |
2019-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363 |
2019-02-08 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 339 |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 219 |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading House H.J. 204 |