SD HB1190 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 433
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 433
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require Legislative approval before a health insurance exchange is created or implemented.
Title
Require Legislative approval before a health insurance exchange is created or implemented.
Sponsors
Rep. Lora Hubbel [R] | Rep. Brian Liss [R] | Rep. Melissa Magstadt [R] | Sen. Stace Nelson [R] |
Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Mark Venner [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 433 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 279 | |
2012-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 21. H.J. 302 | |
2012-01-31 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 255 | |
2012-01-31 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1190jb | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 158 |