SD SB118 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish provisions related to the testing of medical cannabis.
Title
Establish provisions related to the testing of medical cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 S.J. 462 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 457 |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 589 |
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 520 |
2022-03-01 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-03-01 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-15 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 324 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 241 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 241 Amendment 118B |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 232 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 223 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 118A |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 115 |